+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 798
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1065)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1065
Amendment 1-0 to SB2418
+ − Vote
April 1, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9