+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 795
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0674)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Jud Comm.
- Recalled from S. Cal. Comm.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0674
Amendment 1-0 to SB2407
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
February 25, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor