+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/08/2022, 01/01/2023
- Pub. Ch. 785
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/3/2022
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/1/2022
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/15/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2022: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 15, 2022: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (5)
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor