+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/18/2014
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor