+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 97
- Effective date(s) 04/10/2015
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2015
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2015: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 7
March 17, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 17, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 4, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 4, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor