+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor