+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 46, Nays 36 PNV 6
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Curcio, Bricken, Farmer, Shaw)
- H. refused to recede from am. no. 2
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed. (Bell, Stevens, Powers, Gresham, Yarbro)
- Senate refused to recede from amendment
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 6/18/2020
- Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 5
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- H. refused to recede from am. no. 2
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to concur in amendment HA #2.
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 6/17/2020
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0954)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0948)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0956)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0935)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 9, PNV 4
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0955)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0712)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0724)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0723)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (9)
June 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
June 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 19
June 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
June 9, 2020: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor