+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/17/2014
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.