+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 847
- Effective date(s) 04/26/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 1, PNV 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0867)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 15, PNV 9
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0867)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 3, PNV 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0699)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0698)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1
- Yeas: 8
April 9, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 15
April 9, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 15
March 15, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 6, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 6, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor