+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1061
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned by Governor without signature.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1052)
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1148)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1147)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1149)
- Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 24, PNV 0
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 5 - SA1029)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0942)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA1028)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0943)
- Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0999)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 5
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 27
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 27
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 3 BY Harris
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 29, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2