+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/07/2017
- Pub. Ch. 106
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0125)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0071)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2017
- Refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 6, 2017: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 6, 2017: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9