+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1050
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 (Amendment 2 - HA1222)
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 (Amendment 3 - HA1252)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2016
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1252)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1157)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1222)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0742)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0743)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/7/2016
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/31/2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/14/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
April 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY Hazlewood PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
April 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2016: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor