+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1015
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1088)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1088)
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0813)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1087)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1229)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1233)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA1248)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2018
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2
- Yeas: 9
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 25
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY JONES PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 25
March 14, 2018: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9