+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 598
- Effective date(s) 03/28/2014
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0629)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0619)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/20/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. H&WComm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0619
Amendment 1-0 to SB2347
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
February 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
February 12, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 9