+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 791
- Effective date(s) 04/20/2018
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 1
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 4/9/2018
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018
- Reset on next avail. cal.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0839)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0651)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2018
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
- Re-refer to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
March 28, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
February 27, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor