+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 628
- Effective date(s) 03/22/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/29/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/22/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
February 29, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 6
February 22, 2016: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor