+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 901
- Effective date(s) 04/19/2022
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0838)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0727)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 83
April 4, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 22, 2022: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor