+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/16/2016
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/2/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/2/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/24/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/24/2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 16, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor