+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 896
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 896
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0934)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0934
Amendment 1-0 to SB2296
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 9