+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2021: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor