+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 6/3/2020
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor