+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/11/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/3/2020
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/3/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/25/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor