+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee
- Withdrawn.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2007: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2007: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Ketron
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2007: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor