+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 736
- Effective date(s) 08/01/2020
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0818)
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0818)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 8
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 6/11/2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 11, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 8
June 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 8
March 9, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2020: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8