+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 798
- Effective date(s) 07/15/2020
On July 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/5/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2020: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor