+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 746
- Effective date(s) 04/21/2014; 07/01/2015
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0993)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0992)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 6
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0928)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0857)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Bell
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 6
March 19, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor