+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor