+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Held on desk.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1046)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0861)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 0 PNV 3
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 0 PNV 3
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor