+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018
- Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/15/2018
- Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/15/2018
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/1/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor