+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 845
- Effective date(s) 04/26/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1000)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0741)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar 3/22/18
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
March 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 8, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 8, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor