+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 997
- Effective date(s) 05/22/2014
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1128)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1173)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1333)
- H. refused to recede from am. no. 1, 2, & 3
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/17/2014
- S. refused to concur in ams. 1, 2, 3
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Sen. Johnson, Yager, Kyle)
- Conf. comm. appointed (Rep. Parkinson, Dean, Pody)
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 25, Nays 6
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA1173)
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 25, Nays 4, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0938)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1171)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1172)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. C&L Comm. 4/15/14
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 4/1/2014
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 95
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 4 BY Kyle
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor