+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. Ed. Comm. Ayes 0, Nays 8 PNV 1
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 24, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor