+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor