+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 769
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor