+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1042
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018
- Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2018: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor