+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.