+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 813
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2022
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/24/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/9/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/9/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2022: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor