+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 30, 2022: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor