+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 1
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0791
Amendment 1-0 to SB2170
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1