+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 2 PNV 3
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
April 1, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor