+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/25/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.