+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 550
- Effective date(s) 03/09/2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor