+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
April 1, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor