+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 488
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/1/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
April 23, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor