+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8