+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
- Pub. Ch. 981
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/17/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction