+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 779
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 20, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor