+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 1, Nays 7 PNV 1
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/12/2013
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/12/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 19, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1