+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
- Pub. Ch. 461
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0394)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0394)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0127)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/24/21
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 24, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor