+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/7/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/8/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/11/2014
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/4/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2